Rice v. Rochon et al

Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Defendant: Richard Rochon, Robert B Becker, Larry Morton, Manuel Kadre, John E Oxendine, Michael W Pierce, Robert C Farenhem, Jacob J Barker, Michael T Flynn, James Hearnsberger, Patrick Doran, Glenn Charlesworth, Gregory W Fess, Lori Withrow, Mario B Ferrari and Henry G Luken, III
Case Number: 4:2011mc00002
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court sua sponte withdraws the entire reference immediately 2 ; the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court and the Clerk of this Court are directed to take appropriate action to transfer the adversary proceeding 4:10ap-01256 to this Court where it will be docketed as a civil action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/13/11. (vjt)
February 23, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/11. (vjt)
February 2, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gregory H. Bevel on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Rochon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Represented By: Kerry Ann Miller
Represented By: Scott M. DeWolf
Represented By: Gregory H. Bevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rochon
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Becker
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Morton
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Kadre
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Oxendine
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Pierce
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Farenhem
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob J Barker
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Flynn
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hearnsberger
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Doran
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Charlesworth
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W Fess
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Withrow
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario B Ferrari
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry G Luken, III
Represented By: Allison Rantisi Gladden
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?