Hendricks v. Inergy LP et al
Plaintiff: Scott Hendricks
Defendant: Inergy LP and Inergy Propane LLC
Consolidated Defendant: Inergy Holdings LP and Inergy Transportation LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jason Vickers
Case Number: 4:2012cv00069
Filed: February 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: J Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Filing 137 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #109 Judgment,, entered In favor of Scott Hendricks Against Inergy Propane LLC, In favor of Scott Hendricks Against Inergy LP by Scott Hendricks (Edwards, William)
February 21, 2014 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #136 Satisfaction of Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed (removed duplicate docket text). (jak)
February 20, 2014 Filing 136 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Jason Vickers Against Inergy Transportation LLC, (Ogles, Johnson) (Docket text modified on 2/21/2014 to correct the description of the document filed).(jak)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT in favor of Jason Vickers against Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, and Inergy Transportation LLC pursuant to #133 Opinion and Order, in the amount of $65,450.00, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/2014. (mcz)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JUDGMENT in favor of Scott Hendricks against Inergy LP and Inergy Propane LLC, pursuant to #133 Order, in the amount of $75,344.90, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/2014. (mcz)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #118 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Scott Hendricks and #117 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Jason Vickers. The Court awards Hendricks $73,500.00 in attorneys' fees and $1,844.90 in costs, and awards Vickers $65,450.00 in attorneys' fees and does not award any costs. Further, Vickers' motion for access to Inergy's billing records is denied (Dkt #130 ). Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/2014. (mcz)
October 3, 2013 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Cost filed by Jason Vickers. (Ogles, Johnson)
October 1, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE by All Defendants re #130 Reply to Response to Motion Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Vickers' Motion for Billing Records of Defendants Inergy Transportation, LLC and Inergy, LP and Inergy Holdings, L.P. (Doc. 130) (Dean, Justin)
September 17, 2013 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #127 MOTION for Leave to File its Responses to Plaintiffs' Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs Under Seal filed by Jason Vickers. (Ogles, Johnson)
September 17, 2013 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Scott Hendricks. (Edwards, William)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting defts' #127 Motion for Leave to File responses to pltfs' petitions for attorneys' fees and costs under seal; the Clerk is directed to place defts' responses 125 and 126 under seal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/13. (vjt)
September 10, 2013 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to File its Responses to Plaintiffs' Petition for Attorney's Fees and Costs Under Seal by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC (Dean, Justin)
September 9, 2013 Filing 126 SEALED RESPONSE. (Dean, Justin) (Document removed from the docket and filed under seal on 9/11/2013 based on #128 Order. (thd).
September 9, 2013 Filing 125 SEALED RESPONSE. (Dean, Justin) (Document removed from the docket and filed under seal on 9/11/2013 based on #128 Order. (thd).
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting defts' #123 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 9/9/13 to respond to pltfs' motions for attorneys' fees and costs #117 #118 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/20/13. (vjt)
August 19, 2013 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Cost, #118 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #119 Brief in Support by All Defendants (Dean, Justin)
August 12, 2013 Filing 122 SEALED Exhibit "I" (jap)
August 12, 2013 Filing 121 SEALED Exhibit "H" (jap)
August 12, 2013 Filing 120 SEALED Exhibit (jap)
August 12, 2013 Filing 119 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #118 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Scott Hendricks. (Turner, Daniel)
August 12, 2013 Filing 118 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of DOT, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of TMT, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of JDR, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of WHE, #5 Exhibit Itemized Costs of ABTT, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of DRC, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of JTH, #8 Exhibit Itemized Billing of ABTT, #9 Exhibit Itemized Billing of BMJH, #10 Exhibit Exhibit Index)(Turner, Daniel)
August 12, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Cost by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/8/13. (kpr)
August 8, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION to Seal (), MOTION to Seal Document by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #113 Motion to file exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/7/2013. (mcz)
August 7, 2013 Filing 113 MOTION to Seal Document by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Daniel)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 Motion of Jason Vickers for Extension of Time up to and including 8/12/13 to file petitions for attorneys' fees and costs; defts will have until 8/26/13 to respond. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/1/13. (vjt)
July 31, 2013 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUDGMENT pursuant to #108 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Jason Vickers against Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, and Inergy Transportation LLC, in the amount of $38,000 plus prejudgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum from 12/18/10 until the entry of this judgment and postjudgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum from this day until the judgment is satisfied, plus costs of the action and attorneys' fees, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/18/13. (vjt)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #108 the Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is awarded in favor of Scott Hendricks against Inergy, L.P., and Inergy Propane, L.L.C., in the amount of $32,000 plus prejudgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum from September 27, 2011, until the entry of this judgment, and post judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.13% per annum from this day until the judgment is satisfied, plus costs of the action and reasonable attorneys fees, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/18/2013. (kdr)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION AND ORDER granting #70 Inergy's motion to dismiss. The Court retains jurisdiction to determine the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/18/2013. (kdr)
July 16, 2013 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: MOTION HEARING held on Tuesday, 7/16/2013 re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Inergy Transportation LLC, Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC; James Robertson, Larry Watkins, Daniel Turner, John Ogles present for plaintiffs; David Schenberg present for defendants; Court hears argument from counsel; order to follow. (Court Reporter G. Power) (cdw)
July 9, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Dean, Justin)
July 9, 2013 Filing 106 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Vickers by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC.(Hulla, Patrick) (Docket text modified on 7/9/2013 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
July 9, 2013 Filing 105 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Hendricks by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC.(Hulla, Patrick) (Docket text modified on 7/9/2013 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
July 9, 2013 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #105 and #106 Depositions. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Amended Notice to Take Deposition." (thd)
July 5, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Hearing on #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 7/16/2013 at 2:00 PM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes (cdw)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying Jason Vickers' #69 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part Scott Hendricks' #72 Motion to Compel; granting Vickers' #100 Motion to Set a Date Certain for defts to respond to pltfs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/13. (vjt)
June 25, 2013 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #100 MOTION to Shorten Time And Set Date Certain filed by Jason Vickers. (Ogles, Johnson)
June 24, 2013 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION to Shorten Time And Set Date Certain filed by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Schenberg, David)
June 20, 2013 Filing 100 MOTION to Shorten Time And Set Date Certain by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
June 10, 2013 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Jason Vickers. (Ogles, Johnson)
June 5, 2013 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #72 MOTION to Compel filed by Scott Hendricks. (Edwards, William)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Jason Vickers' Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief; the reply brief must be filed within seven days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/3/13. (vjt)
May 31, 2013 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Schenberg, David)
May 31, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Hendricks' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; the brief must be filed by 6/7/13. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/30/13. (tjb)
May 30, 2013 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Scott Hendricks (Edwards, William)
May 28, 2013 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Compel (Hendricks) filed by Inergy Propane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hulla, Patrick)
May 28, 2013 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Compel filed by Inergy Propane LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hulla, Patrick)
May 24, 2013 Filing 90 Sealed Document (sld)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #80 MOTION of Benjamin K. Pollitzer to Withdraw as counsel of record for Scott Hendricks. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/13. (vjt)
May 24, 2013 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Scott Hendricks. (Edwards, William)
May 24, 2013 Filing 87 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #83 Motion to Certify Class, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Daniel)
May 24, 2013 Filing 86 ADDENDUM to #83 MOTION Certify Class by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T - Sealed Exhibit , #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V #4 Exhibit W, #5 Exhibit X, #6 Exhibit Index)(Turner, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 5/24/2013 to correct the description of the document filed and the Exhibit descriptions.) (thd).
May 24, 2013 Filing 85 ADDENDUM to #83 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Under Seal, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit Q - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit R - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit S)(Turner, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 5/24/2013 to correct the description of the document filed and the Exhibit descriptions.) (thd)
May 24, 2013 Filing 84 ADDENDUM to #83 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I - Under Seal #3 Exhibit J - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit K - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit L - Under Seal, #6 Exhibit M - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit N - Under Seal)(Turner, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 5/24/2013 to correct the description of the document filed and the Exhibit descriptions.) (thd).
May 24, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Under Seal, (5) Exhibit E - Under Seal, #6 Exhibit F - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit G - Under Seal(Turner, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 5/24/2013 to correct the Exhibit descriptions.) (thd).
May 24, 2013 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #83 , #84 , #85 and #86 MOTIONS to Certify Class. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #83 was modifieid to correct the description of the Exhibits attached to the motion. The docket text for docket entries #84 , #85 , and #86 was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "ADDENDUM to #83 Motion to Certify Class" and to correct the description of the Exhibits attached to the entries.(thd)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #77 #78 Jason Vickers's motions for protective order; and granting the defendants' request to extend the deadline for responding to the motion for conditional collective action certification is also granted. The deadline for responding to the forthcoming motion for conditional collective action certification is extended up to and including the tenth day after the deposition of Jason Vickers. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/23/2013. (kdr)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting pltfs' #76 Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/23/13. (vjt)
May 23, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Benjamin K. Pollitzer by Scott Hendricks (Robertson, James)
May 22, 2013 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION for Protective Order With Brief filed by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schenberg, David)
May 22, 2013 Filing 78 MOTION for Protective Order by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Todd)
May 22, 2013 Filing 77 MOTION for Protective Order With Brief by Jason Vickers (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief)(Ogles, Johnson)
May 22, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Daniel)
May 21, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Vickers by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC.(Hulla, Patrick)
May 21, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Hendricks by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC.(Hulla, Patrick)
May 17, 2013 Filing 73 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #72 Motion to Compel, filed by Scott Hendricks. (Edwards, William)
May 17, 2013 Filing 72 MOTION to Compel by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "F")(Edwards, William)
May 14, 2013 Filing 71 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #70 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schenberg, David)
May 14, 2013 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC (Schenberg, David)
May 14, 2013 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel by Jason Vickers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery and letter)(Ogles, Johnson)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion to Continue the deadline for class action certification; pltfs' shall file their motion for class certification on or before 5/24/13; defts' response due 6/7/13; pltfs' reply due 6/14/13. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/27/13. (vjt)
March 26, 2013 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Continue by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Daniel)
January 8, 2013 Filing 66 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 11/12/2013 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes; Discovery due by 8/30/2013; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/23/2013; Status Report due by 9/13/2013. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER the motions to compel #52 #55 are denied as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/12. (vjt)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Grant P. Alexander to Appear pro hac vice for deft Inergy Propane LLC, and Relief from Local Rule 83.5(d). Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/12. (vjt)
December 7, 2012 Filing 63 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Schenberg, David)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Limited Admission. Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld is hereby admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendant Inergy Propane, L.L.C., in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/5/2012. (dmn)
December 4, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Relief from Local Rule 83.5(D) by Grant P. Alexander for Inergy Propane LLC (jap)
December 4, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Relief from Local Rule 83.5(d) by Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld for defendant Inergy Propane LLC (jap)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 Jason Vickers motion for scheduling order; setting aside the #34 scheduling order; directing the parties to hold a joint Rule 26(f) conference within 30 days from the entry of this Order and to submit a joint Rule 26(f) report within 30 days thereafter; and denying #57 Hendricks' motion for a status conference or for an expedited hearing on the motion to compel. If the parties are unable to resolve the issues raised in the Hendricks' motion and amended motion to compel, the defendants' response will be due within 14 days after the Rule 16 conference. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/9/2012. (kdr)
October 8, 2012 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION for Hearing and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Compel, #56 MOTION to Clarify AND SET SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schenberg, David)
October 5, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Hearing and for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Compel by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Pollitzer, Benjamin)
October 5, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to Clarify AND SET SCHEDULING ORDER by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
October 4, 2012 Filing 55 Amended MOTION to Compel by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Edwards, William)
October 2, 2012 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Supp Rule 26 Disclosures/Supp Responses to Hendricks' First Rogs and RFPD) (Schenberg, David)
October 2, 2012 Filing 53 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #52 Motion to Compel filed by Scott Hendricks. (Edwards, William)
October 2, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION to Compel by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs' Responses to Pltf's Discover, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Initial Rule 26 Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Letter, #5 Exhibit Letter)(Edwards, William)
September 27, 2012 Filing 51 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Transportation LLC.(Schenberg, David)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/26/2012. (kdr)
September 25, 2012 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Protective Order)(Schenberg, David)
September 25, 2012 Filing 48 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC. Amendment to #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) (Schenberg, David)
September 21, 2012 Filing 47 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC.(Schenberg, David)
September 12, 2012 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jason Vickers, filed by Jason Vickers(Ogles, Johnson)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Amend Complaint; Jason Vickers must file his amended complaint within seven days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/12. (vjt)
September 6, 2012 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, filed by Scott Hendricks(Edwards, William)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Hendricks's second amended complaint must be filed within seven days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/5/12. (vjt)
August 22, 2012 Filing 42 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Complaint by Jason Vickers (Ogles, Johnson)
August 21, 2012 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Hendricks' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants (Hulla, Patrick)
August 15, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Class-Action)(Pollitzer, Benjamin)
August 15, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Edwards, Jr on behalf of Scott Hendricks (Edwards, William)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Scott Hendricks' Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 11/7/12 to file motion and brief requesting certification as a collective action; defts' response regarding certification will be due by 11/21/12, with a reply due no later than 11/28/12. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)
August 13, 2012 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re consolidated case 4:12CV00136, defts' motion to dismiss the complaint of Jason Vickers is granted, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Vickers shall have 30 days to file a motion for leave to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/6/12. (vjt)
July 20, 2012 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Inergy Holdings LP, Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, Inergy Transportation LLC (Ds' Cert of Service of Initial Discovery to Hendricks and Vickers) (Anthony, Sara)
June 26, 2012 Filing 34 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 5/20/2013 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes; Discovery due by 3/7/2013; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/30/2013; Status Report due by 3/21/2013. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
June 25, 2012 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Scott Hendricks. (Turner, Daniel)
June 25, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Hulla, Patrick)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting joint motion to consolidate case 4:12CV00136 with LEAD CASE 4:12CV00069; all further pleadings should be filed in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/12. (vjt)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:12CV00069-JLH and 4:12CV00136-BSM for Discovery Purposes. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/25/12. (vjt)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting defts' #28 Motion to Extend Rule 26(f) Deadlines; Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/11/2012; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/25/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/12. (vjt)
May 9, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Continue Rule 26(f) Deadlines by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Schenberg, David)
May 4, 2012 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Scott Hendricks. (Turner, Daniel)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting pltf's #25 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 5/4/12 to respond to #22 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/12. (vjt)
April 23, 2012 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Scott Hendricks (Turner, Daniel)
April 12, 2012 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC.(Anthony, Sara)
April 9, 2012 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC. (Hulla, Patrick)
April 9, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Hulla, Patrick)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/3/2012. (pag)
March 26, 2012 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC, filed by Scott Hendricks(Wakefield, Samuel)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting pltf's #15 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; pltf's amended complaint must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/12. (vjt)
March 19, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin K. Pollitzer on behalf of Scott Hendricks (Pollitzer, Benjamin)
March 16, 2012 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Scott Hendricks. (Wakefield, Samuel)
March 16, 2012 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scott Hendricks. (Wakefield, Samuel)
March 15, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Scott Hendricks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Wakefield, Samuel)
March 13, 2012 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Anthony, Sara)
March 13, 2012 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/10/2012; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/24/2012; proposed jury trial date the week of 2/11/2013 in Little Rock. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Motions for Sara B. Anthony #5 and David L. Schenberg #6 to Appear pro hace vice for defts in this matter; the requirement of Local Rule 83.5(d) that local counsel be designated is waived. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/5/12. (vjt)
March 2, 2012 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint Class Action by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC.(Hulla, Patrick)
March 2, 2012 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC. (Hulla, Patrick)
March 2, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Hulla, Patrick)
March 2, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Relief from Local Rule 83.5(d) by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing fromthe United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for David L. Schenberg, #2 Exhibit Declaration and oath of David L. Schenberg)(Hulla, Patrick)
March 2, 2012 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Relief from Local Rule 83.5(d) by Inergy LP, Inergy Propane LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri for Sara B. Anthony, #2 Exhibit Declaration and Oath of Sara B. Anthony)(Hulla, Patrick)
February 28, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Francis Hulla on behalf of All Defendants (Hulla, Patrick)
February 16, 2012 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Inergy, LP, filed by Scott Hendricks. Inergy LP served on 2/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card Receipt)(Wakefield, Samuel)
February 13, 2012 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Inergy Propane, LLC, filed by Scott Hendricks. Inergy Propane LLC served on 2/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card Receipt)(Wakefield, Samuel)
February 1, 2012 Filing 1 CLASS-ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Scott Hendricks against Inergy LP & Inergy Propane LLC; Summonses Issued and returned to attorney; Filing fee of $350.00 paid, receipt #LIT032261. (kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Inergy LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Inergy Holdings LP
Represented By: David L. Schenberg
Represented By: Sara B. Anthony
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Represented By: Patrick Francis Hulla
Represented By: Edmund Burke Huber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Inergy Transportation LLC
Represented By: David L. Schenberg
Represented By: Sara B. Anthony
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Represented By: Patrick Francis Hulla
Represented By: Edmund Burke Huber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inergy LP
Represented By: Sara B. Anthony
Represented By: Patrick Francis Hulla
Represented By: David L. Schenberg
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inergy Propane LLC
Represented By: Sara B. Anthony
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Grant P. Alexander
Represented By: Patrick Francis Hulla
Represented By: David L. Schenberg
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jason Vickers
Represented By: Gregory D. Taylor
Represented By: Johnson D. Ogles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hendricks
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Represented By: William H. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Benjamin K. Pollitzer
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Represented By: James D. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?