Hite v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Carolyn S Hite
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2012cv00079
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees; and approving attorney fees in the amount of $1247.75; directing the award of EAJA fees be paid directly to Plaintiff's counsel subject to any offset to satisfy any pre-existing debt owed to the U.S.; and directing Defendant to certify said award and pay Plaintiff's attorney this amount. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/14/2013. (srw)
March 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 15 Memorandum & Order filed in this matter this date, the decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded for action consistent with the opinion in this case. This is a "sentence four" remand within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/8/2013. (srw)
July 18, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting counsel to advise the Court within 15 days of the entry of this Order to schedule oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/18/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hite v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Hite
Represented By: David P. Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?