Green v. Humbrecht et al

Plaintiff: Robert Green
Defendant: Jerry Humbrecht, Mitch Watkins and Molex Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00109
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. The 4 amended complaint and all claims in this action against defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/31/2013. (dmn)
October 17, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Compel. Mr. Green is directed to comply with this Order within 10 days. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/17/12. (kpr)
August 17, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Consideration of deft's pending motion to compel. The pltf shall have until 9/4/12 to file a response to defts' motion to compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Humbrecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Green
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Humbrecht
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Represented By: Cintra B. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Watkins
Represented By: Cintra B. McArdle
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molex Inc
Represented By: Cintra B. McArdle
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?