Travis v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company

Plaintiff: June Travis
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv00113
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 40 Order granting the parties' joint motion to dismiss and dismissing the complaint and counterclaim with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/13. (kpr)
July 24, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss and denying alternative motion for summary judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/12. (kpr)
May 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that this Court does have jurisdiction over this matter, and the case may move forward. Travis should file her response to Stewart's motion for summary judgment by May 7, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/12. (kpr)
April 11, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file simultaneous briefs (no more than five pages) by April 18, 2012. Travis's ddl to respond to the pending motion for summary judgment is suspended and all action is stayed on that motion until it has resolved the jurisdictional issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Serena Thompson Green
Represented By: Marian Major McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Travis
Represented By: Michael Grant Ragland
Represented By: William R. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?