Select Energy Services LLC v. Lebel

Plaintiff: Select Energy Services LLC
Defendant: Michael Lebel
Case Number: 4:2012cv00149
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 26 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/11/12. (vjt)
April 25, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to inform the Court on or before 5/4/12, whether it desires that a hearing be set on its motion for preliminary injunction or whether this action may proceed to a trial on the merits and its motion be denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/25/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing parties that 5 MOTION to Strike and Dismiss Select Energy's complaint or alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Lebel, will be considered solely as a Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)
March 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the deadline for filing a response to the pending motions 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Select Energy Services LLC, and 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Lebel, is 3/23/12, with replies due 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/16/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Energy Services LLC v. Lebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Energy Services LLC
Represented By: David Wayne Sterling
Represented By: Melanie J. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lebel
Represented By: James R. Mulroy, II
Represented By: O. John Norris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?