Krupicki v. Eagle One Inc

Plaintiff: Stanley Krupicki
Defendant: Eagle One Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00150
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 84 Order entered on this day, FLSA claims are dismissed with prejudice and ADTPA claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/3/2014. (mmd)
August 29, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Leave to File; denying 59 Motion in Limine; denying 62 Motion in Limine; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties have 14 days from the date of service o f copies of any supplemented or amended and substituted motion for summary judgment to file a response, and the moving party has seven days after that to file a reply in further support of the motion. All parties have until September 12, 2013, to fi le, should they choose to do so, supplemented or amended and substituted motions for summary judgment addressing the financial materials plaintiff produced in response to defendants discovery requests as ordered by the Court on January 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/29/13. (kpr)
January 22, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/22/13. (kpr)
October 15, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the class certification hearing scheduled for October 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Strike 9 Answer. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/28/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krupicki v. Eagle One Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Krupicki
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle One Inc
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?