Drewry v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeff S Drewry
Defendant: 3M Company, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2012cv00153
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 68 Motion to Dismiss; granting 78 Motion to Extend Time. Whittaker shall have up to and including August 30, 2013, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/7/13. (kpr)
July 12, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting that BASF Catalysts LLC shall be substituted in place of BASF Corporation as a defendant in this action in all pleadings and papers served or filed in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/13. (kpr)
May 1, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice as to separate defendant 3M Company. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/1/13. (kpr)
January 10, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the ddl for the case-in-chief expert disclosure to 2/26/13 and rebuttal disclosures to 3/29/13. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/13. (kpr)
August 1, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice and admitting Bradlyn J. Cole to appear as co-counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/1/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drewry v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: William H. Edwards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Ronald D. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff S Drewry
Represented By: Aaron Louis Martin
Represented By: Brandon Hughes
Represented By: James C. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?