Razorbacks Moisture v. Graphic Packaging International Inc

Plaintiff: Razorbacks Moisture
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00158
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/05/2014. (rhm)
March 7, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part GPI's 23 motion for partial summary judgment; denying Razorback's 27 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2014. (mmd)
July 16, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing trial from the docket for the week of July 29, 2013. The trial will be reset by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/16/13. (kpr)
June 18, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/18/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razorbacks Moisture v. Graphic Packaging International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Razorbacks Moisture
Represented By: David Louis Gershner
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International Inc
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?