Walden et al v. Humphrey et al

Plaintiff: David Walden and Dana Walden
Defendant: Lolowana Humphrey, BME Enterprise LLC and BME LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00190
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 13 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/12. (kpr)
November 30, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiffs to take some action by 12/14/12, or the court will dismiss without prejudice for failure to prosecute and lack of good service. The Court hesitates to recognize the notice of settlement as a pre-service dismissal when it neither requests that action nor recites the Rule. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/12. (kpr)
August 21, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/21/12. (kpr)
August 6, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Waldens to explain, by August 17, 2012, why good service exists on BME Enterprise LLC. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden et al v. Humphrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolowana Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BME Enterprise LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BME LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walden
Represented By: Danny Ray Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Walden
Represented By: Danny Ray Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?