Denton v. Conveyor Technology et al

Plaintiff: Gloria Denton
Defendant: Conveyor Technology and Justin Carmody
Case Number: 4:2012cv00191
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Gloria Denton against Justin Carmody on his counterclaim for fraud 100 . Judgment in favor of Ms. Denton on Mr. Carmodys counterclaim for fraud is hereby entered. Mr. Carmodys counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice. The judgment in favor of defendants on Ms. Dentons Fair Labor Standards Act claim stands 94 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/20/13. (kpr)
June 7, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Conveyor Technology & Components Inc, Justin Carmody against Gloria Denton re 92 93 Jury Verdicts in the amount of $24,225.00, together with post-judgment interest at the rate of 0.14% per annum from the date of the Judgment until paid. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/7/13. (kpr)
June 1, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/1/2013. (jlp)
February 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Substitute deft Conveyor Technology with Conveyor Technology & Components, Inc., individually and d/b/a Conveyor Technology and Components, Inc. Ms. Denton is directed to file the amended and substituted complaint on or before March 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/26/13. (kpr)
February 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/25/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Conveyor Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conveyor Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Denton
Represented By: Cheslee Sizemore Mahan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?