Lewis v. Holladay et al

Plaintiff: Danny Lewis
Defendant: Hamilton, Sarah Speer and Doc Holladay
Case Number: 4:2012cv00208
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 66 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/26/2013. (dmn)
January 2, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Barbara Harris are dismissed without prejudice and her name is removed as a party defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/2/13. (kpr)
September 12, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving Matthew Stephen Modelevsky as counsel of record for pltf; denying pltf's 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; the Clerk is directed to send pltf a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/12/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Holladay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Speer
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?