Smith v. Emerson et al

Plaintiff: Roosevelt Smith
Defendant: Rick Emerson, Jacob Zulpo and Rafiel
Case Number: 4:2012cv00219
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 51 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2013. (dmn)
February 5, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file, within 15 days of the entry of this Order, a response to the 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joe Nutt and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with the instructions set forth in this Order and with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/5/13. (kpr)
November 2, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to defs' 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Joe Nutt within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/12. (kpr)
August 20, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing defts Emerson, Rafiel, Zulpo and Mehler, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/20/12. (kpr)
July 30, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/30/12. (kpr)
April 26, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or an ifp motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to pltf an ifp motion, along with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/26/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Emerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Zulpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?