Cruthis v. Vision's et al

Plaintiff: Keyli Cruthis and Cortny Spurlock
Defendant: Darrin Gamble, Minor Booth, William Marfoglio and Vision's
Case Number: 4:2012cv00244
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/19/2014. (rhm)
January 24, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 73 Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants' motion as to separate defendant Mr. Booth's liability after 2/22/2012 is granted, and the motion is denied in other respects. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/24/2014. (thd)
December 5, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Quash. The subpoenas at issue in the current motion are hereby modified in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/5/13. (kpr)
August 7, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Compel. Separate defendant Visions is ordered to supplement its responses to Plaintiff Keyli Cruthis' First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents in light of the Court's Opinion and Order of August 7, 2013. Visions is ordered to supplement these responses within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/7/13. (kpr) (Modified on 8/7/2013 to correct typographical error). (vjt)
October 30, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Strike ; denying 19 Motion for Leave to File; denying 21 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the style of the case to reflect that William Marfoglio and Darrin Gamble are no longer parties. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/30/12. (kpr)
September 11, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating this case with case number 4:12-cv-279. This case (4:12-cv-244) shall now be the lead case. All further pleadings shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruthis v. Vision's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minor Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Marfoglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyli Cruthis
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortny Spurlock
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?