Smith v. Caterpillar Inc

Plaintiff: Pamela R Smith
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00326
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/11/2013. (dmn)
April 10, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties reached a settlement following a conference held on 4/10/2013. The settlement agreement which the Court dictated into the record is filed under a Confidentiality Agreement therefore its content shall not be disclosed without a court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/10/2013. (kcs)
August 27, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Virgil Woodrow Young, Jr. to represent plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Young a copy of this Order and the entire case file. If he is unable to serve as counsel, he must file a motion to withdraw within 21 days of the receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/27/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Caterpillar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela R Smith
Represented By: L. D. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?