Garris v. J B Hunt Transport Inc et al

Plaintiff: Charlene Garris
Defendant: Elisa Norman, Rhonda Woods, J B Hunt Transport Inc, J B Hunt Transport Services Inc, J B Hunt Logistics Inc, Robert Pflug, Quest Diagnostic Clinical Laboratories Inc and Compliance Safety Systems
Case Number: 4:2012cv00363
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's claims against J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. with prejudice. 63 65 . All of Garris's claims against all other defts are dismissed without prejudice 23 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/14. (kpr)
August 2, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, denying in part and denying as moot in part, the 6 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to amend (de#18) is granted, as modified. Garris should file her amended complaint, eliminating the dismissed retaliation claim, by August 10, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/2/12. (kpr)
July 19, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss and finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Garris's complaint is dismissed without prejudice against all parties except J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garris v. J B Hunt Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisa Norman
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Woods
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Hunt Transport Inc
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Hunt Transport Services Inc
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Hunt Logistics Inc
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pflug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostic Clinical Laboratories Inc
Represented By: D. Faye Caldwell
Represented By: William Stuart Jackson
Represented By: Seth R. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compliance Safety Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Garris
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?