Williams v. North Point Automotive Group et al

Plaintiff: Lonnie E Williams
Defendant: Arkansas Automotive Services LLC, North Point Automotive Group and Asbury Automotive Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00393
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS: Pursuant to the 58 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Lonnie E. Williams against NP VKW, LLC, d/b/a North Point Mazda/Volkswagen, in the total amount of $168,429.07 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.12% per annum. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/18/2014. (ks)
February 7, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 51 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, judgment is entered in favor of Lonnie E Williams against Asbury Automotive Group Inc, NP VKW LLC, North Point Automotive Group in the amount of $117,821.56 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.11% per annum from this date until the judgment is satisfied. The Plaintiff's claims against Asbury Auto Group, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
November 12, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting bench trial to begin at 9:15 a.m. on Tuesday, November 19, 2013, in Courtroom #4-D re 13 Amended Scheduling Order. Counsel should be present by 8:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/12/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. North Point Automotive Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Automotive Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Point Automotive Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury Automotive Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie E Williams
Represented By: Melva H. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?