Farmer v. Roberson et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Farmer
Defendant: Jim Roberson, Cornwell, Williams, Langly and Lucas
Case Number: 4:2012cv00418
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 28 Memorandum & Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/13/2013. (srw)
May 31, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Defendants' Motion to Compel; directing Plaintiff to fully and completely respond to the Defendants' discovery requests within 14 days of the date of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to sign and produce a Medical Authorization within 14 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/31/2013. (srw)
February 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 Partial Report and Recommendations re 2 Complaint filed by Anthony Farmer. Deft Roberson is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/13. (kpr)
January 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service on defts Officer Cornwell, Deputy Williams, Jailer Lucas, and Jailer Langly. The Clerk shall prepare summons, and the U.S. Marshal shall serve these defts with a copy of the Complaint and summons, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/17/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Roberson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?