Smith et al v. Southwestern Energy Company

Plaintiff: William V Smith and Margaret Smith
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv00423
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 85 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered granting 77 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing Plaintiff's claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/14/2013. (dmn)
May 13, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Southwestern Energy Company's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and to Stay all Discovery. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/13/2013. (dmn)
March 7, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 66 MOTION to Stay Ruling and Motion to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/7/13. (kpr)
February 20, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Seal Exhibits 5 and 6 attached to plaintiff's 39 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order. The Clerk is directed to seal these exhibits. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/20/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Southwestern Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William V Smith
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Smith
Represented By: Paul Berry Cooper, III
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?