Colclough et al v. Little Rock Restaurant Properties LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chec Colclough and Jemiah Colclough
Defendant: James Snyder, Little Rock Restaurant Properties LLC, Juanita's Restaurant Inc, Joe Cates and James O'Brien
Case Number: 4:2012cv00515
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: consistent with the 30 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/03/2013. (rhm)
August 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as moot and suspending the Final Scheduling Order due to the parties' settlement on May 1, 2013. The Court will enter judgment dismissing all claims with prejudice on September 28, 2013, unless one of the parties seeks some other action before that date. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/13. (kpr)
May 1, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the parties have reached a settlement in this case and the agreement which the Court dictated into the record is filed under a Confidentiality Agreement therefore its content shall not be disclosed without a court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/01/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colclough et al v. Little Rock Restaurant Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Restaurant Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita's Restaurant Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chec Colclough
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemiah Colclough
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?