Smith v. ConAgra Frozen Foods Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tanya Smith
Defendant: Terry Steen and ConAgra Frozen Foods Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00517
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 Opinion Arkansas Supreme Court. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Pope County, Arkansas, for want of subject matter jurisdiction 56 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/13. (kpr)
December 13, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 54 Certification of Issue to State Court. The Court thinks Smith's retaliation claim against Steen is not barred by limitations. Steen's presence in the case destroys complete diversity. Remand appears to be appropriate. If any party disagrees, the party should file an objection by December 27, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/13. (kpr)
February 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION ORDER, purs to Rule 6-8 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the State of Arkansas, this Court certifies to the Supreme Court of Arkansas a question of law that may be determinative of this case. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward this Order to the Supreme Court of Arkansas under his official seal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/4/13. (kpr)
January 17, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER attaching draft certification order. The parties should file any suggested changes, objections, or acceptance by 1/31/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/13. (kpr)
January 8, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Smith's Equal Pay Act claim with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/13. (kpr)
November 29, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 28 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Court directs Smith to file her amended complaint by 12/7/12 stating her remaining claims more definitely. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/29/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. ConAgra Frozen Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Frozen Foods Inc
Represented By: Brittany M. Ems
Represented By: Josef S. Glynias
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Smith
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?