Benefield et al v. Convacare Management Inc et al

Plaintiff: Susie Tosh, Amanda White, Kimberly Benefield, Veatrice Childress, Janis Franks, Penny Hill, Vicki Keller, Jennifer Kirker, Christopher Mathis, Krystal Reeves, Lisa Strain and Rosa Taylor
Defendant: Convacare Management Inc, Rolling Hills HC Inc, Joey Wiggins and John Does
Case Number: 4:2012cv00589
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving settlement agreements 97 and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/5/2014. (ljb)
August 20, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on the parties' written representations to this Court, this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of November 3, 2014, and all pending motions are denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/20/2014. (jak)
August 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/29/13. (kpr)
May 1, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim without prejudice filed by Joey Wiggins. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/1/13. (kpr)
December 7, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney AMBER SCHUBERT AS NAMED COUNSEL filed by Kimberly Benefield, Lisa Strain, Jennifer Kirker, Susie Tosh, Veatrice Childress, Rosa Taylor, Christopher Mathis, Janis Franks, Penny Hill, Vicki Keller, Amanda White, Krystal Reeves. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benefield et al v. Convacare Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Tosh
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda White
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Benefield
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veatrice Childress
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Franks
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Hill
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Keller
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kirker
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mathis
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Reeves
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Strain
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Taylor
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E. Burgess
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convacare Management Inc
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Joseph Alan Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Hills HC Inc
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Joseph Alan Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Wiggins
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Donna S. Galchus
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Joseph Alan Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?