Conway Steel Fabrication Inc v. Stabridg Construction Co Inc et al

Plaintiff: Conway Steel Fabrication Inc
Defendant: Keith Bridgham, Elaine Weems, Masonry IV Inc, Stabridg Construction Co Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc and Richard Stacey
Cross_defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc and Stabridg Construction Co Inc
Cross_claimant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc and Stabridg Construction Co Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00616
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT: It is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that plaintiff Conway Steel Fabrication, Inc. does recover of and from defendant Stabridg Construction Co., Inc. the sum of One Hundred Sixty-Four Thousand, One Hundred Seven and 19/100 dollars($164,107.19) for which execution and garnishment may issue as provided by law. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/2013. (dmn)
May 10, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss and to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/10/13. (kpr)
April 1, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss separate defendant Masonry IV without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)
October 18, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of James H. Starnes as attorney for defts Stabrid Construction Co., Inc., Richard Stacey, Keith Bridgham, and Elaine Weems. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway Steel Fabrication Inc v. Stabridg Construction Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Stabridg Construction Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bridgham
Represented By: James H. Starnes
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Weems
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Represented By: James H. Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonry IV Inc
Represented By: Joel Franklin Hoover
Represented By: Ashley D. Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stabridg Construction Co Inc
Represented By: James H. Starnes
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stacey
Represented By: James H. Starnes
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: John F. Peiserich
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Stabridg Construction Co Inc
Represented By: Matthew Richard House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conway Steel Fabrication Inc
Represented By: Benjamin A. Kent
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?