Graham v. Tax Group Center Inc et al

Plaintiff: Gene Graham
Defendant: Tony Gagliardo and Tax Group Center Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv00644
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to a confidentiality agreement, which has been made part of the settlement agreement, the transcript setting forth the terms of the settlement will remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/07/2014. (kcs)
April 16, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Strike. If Defendants intend to call Nittolo at trial, they will have to provide solid contact information in their pre-trial disclosure sheet. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/2014. (jak)
January 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss TGC's counterclaim. Motion 21 is granted. TCG's amended answer, including the counterclaim, is due by January 14, 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Tax Group Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Group Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Graham
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?