Collins et al v. Barney's Barn Inc et al

Plaintiff: Erin Townsend, Chris Cruthis, Marcus Stevens, Jane Doe, Nicole Collins, Casi Hudson and Rachel Hillman
Defendant: Michael Jones, Barney's Barn Inc, Danny Martindill and Casey Martindill
Case Number: 4:2012cv00685
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion to Continue the bench trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/3/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Second Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs are hereby awarded $6,670.00 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/2014. (jak)
March 25, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 motion for attorney fees; denying 57 motion for reconsideration of orders imposing sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/25/2014. (mmd)
January 13, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs may submit a motion seeking reasonable expenses and attorney's fees. Defendants shall provide complete responses to Plaintiffs' discovery requests within 5 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/2014. (ks)
December 17, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 MOTION for sanctions by plaintiffs. Defendants have up to and including December 18, 2013 in which to file a response to Plaintiffs motion for sanctions, and Plaintiffs have up to and including December 27, 2013 in which to file a reply. The bench trial scheduled for January 6, 2014 is continued. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/17/2013. (ks)
April 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, 6 Motion to Certify Class and 16 Motion for Ruling. Plaintiffs' motion for equitable tolling is denied and Plaintiffs' motions for the production of contact information and approval of notice are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/17/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. Barney's Barn Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Townsend
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Cruthis
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Stevens
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Collins
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casi Hudson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hillman
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney's Barn Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Martindill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Martindill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?