M&K Restaurant LLC et al v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: M&K Restaurant LLC, Kay Perry, Juanita Canton Perry, Michael Clay Perry, Harvey Doyne Perry, Martha Shirlene Perry Jones, Jay Brook Perry, Carla Janette Perry, Stanley Brian Perry, Sherri Perry, Michael Kerri Perry, Brian Perry and Jonathan Culver
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company Inc, Dennis Ray Henley and John Does
Case Number: 4:2012cv00783
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 99 stipulation of dismissal. Each party will bear its own costs and fees incurred in the litigation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/27/2015. (rhm)
July 8, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 plaintiffs' motion to strike; denying 12 46 motions for summary judgment; denying 44 Farmers' motion to dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 39 Farmers' motion to quash the jury demand. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/08/2014. (rhm)
November 22, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Compel. Defendant Farmers Insurance Company (Farmers) shall have until Monday, December 2, 2013, to produce the documents at issue in response to plaintiffs discovery requests. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/22/13. (kpr)
November 21, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 MOTION to Compel. The Court will conduct a telephone conference to discuss plaintiffs motion to compel on Friday, November 22, 2013, beginning at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/21/13. (kpr)
October 18, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw 6 Motion for Default Judgment. Separate defendant Mr. Henleys motion for relief to accept late filing and response opposing plaintiffs motion for default judgment 27 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/13. (kpr)
August 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 MOTION for Default Judgment. Mr. Hensley is directed to file a response to plaintiffs' motion within 10 days of this Order, on or before August 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/12/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&K Restaurant LLC et al v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&K Restaurant LLC
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Canton Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clay Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Doyne Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Shirlene Perry Jones
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brook Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Janette Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Brian Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kerri Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Perry
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Culver
Represented By: Jason W. Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ray Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?