Woods v. North Little Rock School District

Plaintiff: Pheleisa J Woods
Defendant: North Little Rock School District
Case Number: 4:2012cv00788
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/2015. (ks)
December 17, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court has been notified that this matter has settled. The parties are to file an appropriate motion or stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/17/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Defendant to file a document showing cause why the 18 Motion for Summary Judgment, 19 Brief in Support and 20 Statement of Material Facts should remain under seal within seven days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is hereby given fourteen days from the date of this Order to weigh in on this matter should she so choose. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/2014. (jak)
February 10, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Continue. The 13 Final Scheduling Order is hereby vacated. The Court will issue an Amended Final Scheduling Order in due course. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. North Little Rock School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pheleisa J Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?