Bank of the Ozarks v. Captial Mortage Coroporation et al

Plaintiff: Bank of the Ozarks
Defendant: David E Aronstein, Ronald Lipsitz, Fred B Wachter, Honey Creek Properties Inc, Realty Resources Corporation, Capital Mortgage Corporation, First Financial Funding Inc and Prime Equity Lending Inc
Case Number: 4:2012mc00021
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 1 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/18/12. (kpr)
July 9, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew J. Lavoie and John A. Christy for defts. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/12. (kpr)
July 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Stay Deposition of George Gleason. The Court will conduct a telephone hearing on the motion Wednesday, July 11, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. CST. Counsel shall provide the Court with a telephone number at which they can be reac hed for the hearing. Defts have until Monday, July 9, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. to file a response to Bank of the Ozark's motion to quash subpoena, motion for protective order, and motion to stay deposition. Pltf shall have until Tuesday, July 10, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. to submit a reply in further support of its motion, should it opt to do so. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the Ozarks v. Captial Mortage Coroporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E Aronstein
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lipsitz
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred B Wachter
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey Creek Properties Inc
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Resources Corporation
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Funding Inc
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Equity Lending Inc
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Represented By: John A. Christy
Represented By: Andrew J. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the Ozarks
Represented By: Samantha L. Tzoberi
Represented By: John J. Richard
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Osment, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen C. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?