Hull v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tammy Loda Hull
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2013cv00016
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate Hull's 27 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees. Hull may move the Court to reinstate the motion if and when necessary. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
January 15, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees, as modified. The Court awards a reasonable attorney's fee of $12,220.20 (65.7 hours at $186 an hour), payable to Hull, and costs of $86.90, payable to Hull's lawyer. Both checks should be mailed to Hull's lawyer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/14. (kpr)
September 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 17 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations remanding case for further proceedings pursuant to "sentence four" within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/19/13. (kpr)
June 27, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting the parties to advise the Court within 15 days of the entry of this Order if they wish to schedule oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/27/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Loda Hull
Represented By: Jim Carfagno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?