Smith v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Defendant: Van Buren County Detention Center and Timothy Adams
Case Number: 4:2013cv00025
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 26 Order dismissing the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/22/13. (kpr)
July 2, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within thirty days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the granting of Defendants Motion and the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiffs Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/2/13. (kpr)
May 29, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 9 Partial Report and Recommendations. The defendant Van Buren County Detention Center is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2013. (dmn)
March 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, without prejudice, 6 Affidavit filed by Anthony Smith. Plaintiff shall submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or a completed ifp application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 15 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to plaintiff an ifp application and calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/4/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?