Burton v. Metso Paper USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tina Burton
Defendant: Metso Paper USA Inc, Metso Corporation, Wartsila North America Inc, Wartsila NSD North America Inc and Doe Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00073
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in accordance with the parties' 143 stipulation of voluntary dismissal and this Court's previous 144 order. As this case has settled, it is removed from the trial calendar for the week of 02/22/2016. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/01/2016. (rhm)
April 23, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Evergreen's motion to quash, or in the alternative, for protective order; granting 61 Ms. Burton's motion for leave to file amended complaint; and, granting 63 Ms. Burton's motion to amend the final scheduling order. Ms. Burton is ordered to file the Amended Complaint within 7 days of entry of the Order. The deadlines in this case are stayed, and an amended final scheduling order will be issued by separate order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/23/2014. (thd)
November 8, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/8/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Metso Paper USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Burton
Represented By: James B. Wilmoth
Represented By: Richard John Zalasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metso Paper USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metso Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wartsila North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wartsila NSD North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?