Hill v. Arkansas Department of Community Correction et al

Defendant: Jerry Bradshaw and Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Plaintiff: Mark A Hill
Case Number: 4:2013cv00089
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Hill's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/2014. (jak)
August 13, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Compel. Hill must respond to the interrogatories by 27 August 2014. If he does not, the Court will consider sanctions, including the dismissal of his case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2014. (jak)
May 24, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's 1983 claim against Bradshaw and his Title VII claim against the Arkansas Department of Community Corrections may proceed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Arkansas Department of Community Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Community Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Hill
Represented By: Shawn Garrick Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?