Allbritton et al v. Wiggins et al

Plaintiff: Adam Allbritton, Sherry Lynn Bell, Kevin Garrison, Biji Jose, Denise Peoples and Deborah Terry
Defendant: Joey Wiggins, Lifespring Therapy Solutions LLC, Cece Todd and Travis Raye
Case Number: 4:2013cv00158
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Having considered the matter, the Court hereby approves the settlement agreement as set forth in the 73 joint motion of the parties for preliminary approval of the Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 settlement agreement. That agreement creates a common sett lement fund of $175,000.00, $105,000 of which will be distributed to Class Members on a pro rata basis based on Lifespring's records of accrued paid time off at the time Lifespring ceased operations. The Court finds that the settlem ent agreement constitutes a significant victory for the Class Members in that the Class Members will receive a substantial monetary recovery that would likely be uncollectible in the absence of the settlement agreement. Without objection, the Court g rants plaintiff's 75 motion for Attorney Fees and hereby awards plaintiffs attorneys' fees, costs, and administrative expenses in the amount of $70,000 constituting 40% of the $175,000 common settlement fund. Having given final approval to the parties' settlement agreement, the Court hereby dismisses this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/2/2015. (ks)
January 30, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Buck Canyon Gibson to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Courthouse on February 2, 2015 and throughout the trial before Judge Susan Webber Wright subject to the rules contained within this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/2015. (jak)
March 13, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards plaintiffs $2,500.00 for their expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred in making the motion to compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allbritton et al v. Wiggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Allbritton
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Lynn Bell
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Garrison
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biji Jose
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Peoples
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Terry
Represented By: Ashley Paige Breech
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifespring Therapy Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cece Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Raye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?