Allbritton et al v. Wiggins et al
Plaintiff: |
Adam Allbritton, Sherry Lynn Bell, Kevin Garrison, Biji Jose, Denise Peoples and Deborah Terry |
Defendant: |
Joey Wiggins, Lifespring Therapy Solutions LLC, Cece Todd and Travis Raye |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00158 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Little Rock Office |
County: |
Faulkner |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Webber Wright |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER: Having considered the matter, the Court hereby approves the settlement agreement as set forth in the 73 joint motion of the parties for preliminary approval of the Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 settlement agreement. That agreement creates a common sett lement fund of $175,000.00, $105,000 of which will be distributed to Class Members on a pro rata basis based on Lifespring's records of accrued paid time off at the time Lifespring ceased operations. The Court finds that the settlem ent agreement constitutes a significant victory for the Class Members in that the Class Members will receive a substantial monetary recovery that would likely be uncollectible in the absence of the settlement agreement. Without objection, the Court g rants plaintiff's 75 motion for Attorney Fees and hereby awards plaintiffs attorneys' fees, costs, and administrative expenses in the amount of $70,000 constituting 40% of the $175,000 common settlement fund. Having given final approval to the parties' settlement agreement, the Court hereby dismisses this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/2/2015. (ks)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER authorizing Buck Canyon Gibson to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Courthouse on February 2, 2015 and throughout the trial before Judge Susan Webber Wright subject to the rules contained within this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/2015. (jak)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards plaintiffs $2,500.00 for their expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred in making the motion to compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2014. (ks)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?