Howard et al v. Arkansas Children's Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Pam Howard and Eben Howard
Defendant: Arkansas Children's Hospital, Ron Robertson and Jon Bates
Movant: USA
Case Number: 4:2013cv00310
Filed: May 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' 174 motion to dismiss the remaining claims without prejudice. This action is hereby terminated. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/7/2015. (ljb)
November 30, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 165 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/30/2015. (ks)
November 18, 2015 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 169 Motion for Continuance. This action is removed from the trial docket for the week of February 22, 2016, and the amended final scheduling order entered on July 23, 2015, is set aside. A new scheduling order with a new trial date a nd new deadlines will be entered separately. Plaintiffs' motion for protective order and to extend time is granted, 170 . The notice issued by the defendants for the plaintiffs' depositions is quashed. The parties should consult and reschedule those depositions at a time convenient for everyone. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/2015. (jak)
July 1, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, 72 . To the extent that the defendants seek judgment that the plaintiffs are not whistleblowers under the False Claims Act, the motion is denied under Rule 56(d). To the extent that the defendants seek judgment that the plaintiffs are not whistleblowers under HIPAA, the motion is denied on the merits. The plaintiffs' second verified motion to stay is denied as moot, 101 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/1/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard et al v. Arkansas Children's Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Howard
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eben Howard
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Children's Hospital
Represented By: Jane W. Duke
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Robertson
Represented By: Mark Arnold Hagemeier
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bates
Represented By: Jane W. Duke
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: USA
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?