Giles v. PrimeLending

Plaintiff: Carnesa R Giles
Defendant: PrimeLending
Case Number: 4:2013cv00311
Filed: May 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. Giles's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2014. (jak)
June 12, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Giles's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2014. (jak)
February 5, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is administratively terminated. If no action has been requested by 12/01/2014, then the Court will reopen and dismiss the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 02/05/2014. (rhm)
October 15, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay and arbitrate the dispute. Status report due February 3, 2014, and every three months thereafter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/15/13. (kpr)
September 26, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2 Stipulation filed by the parties. Defendant's time to file a responsive pleading is extended until October 11, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. PrimeLending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnesa R Giles
Represented By: P. Luevonda Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeLending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?