Canada v. Dominion Enterprises et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Canada
Defendant: Dominion Enterprises, Cross-Sell LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2013cv00345
Filed: June 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 102 Opinion and Order entered separately today, summary judgment is entered in favor of the defendants. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/27/2014. (ks)
February 27, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDEDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER: The plaintiff has filed an unopposed motion for leave to file under seal. That 73 motion is granted. The plaintiff may file under seal a motion for leave to file a first amended complaint. The defendants will be gi ven the proper time under the rules to respond, and the defendants may file the response under seal if the response will include confidential documents. This Amended and Substituted Order replaces the 74 Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/27/2014. (ks)
February 12, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's subpoenas duces tecum. 64 motion for protective order is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/12/2014. (ks)
June 10, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 25 Order on Motion to Transfer Case; directing immediate transfer to ED/AR. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 10, 2013. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 6/10/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. Dominion Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Enterprises
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: W. Keith Ransdell
Represented By: John C. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross-Sell LLC
Represented By: John C. Roach
Represented By: W. Keith Ransdell
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Canada
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?