Barnett v. Americom Bank et al

Plaintiff: Matthew W Barnett
Defendant: Americom Bank and Direct Express Payment Processing Services
Case Number: 4:2013cv00347
Filed: June 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge. The 80 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Comerica Inc. is granted. The 89 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff is denied. His complaint is dismissed, and judgment will be entered for Comerica. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/14/2014. (mcz)
October 25, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; therefore, pltf's motions to amend 48 and for joinder 41 are GRANTED; defts Americom Bank and Direct Express Payment Processing Services are dismissed without prejudice from this c ase; Comerica Inc is added as the lone deft; pltf's motions for default judgment against Americom and Direct Express 27 , to amend his motion for default judgment 30 , for the entry of a clerk's default 35 , and for preliminary injunction 54 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/25/13. (vjt)
August 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's motions for writ of mandamus 10 12 and his motion to stay proceedings 17 18 are denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Americom Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americom Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Express Payment Processing Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew W Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?