Bryant v. USA

Plaintiff: Donald A Bryant
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2013cv00376
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 3 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice, and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/30/13. (kpr)
August 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to release all documents included with the notice he filed on July 29, 2013 back to Mr. Bryant with the understanding that Mr. Bryant will resubmit these documents to the Court for filing with copies, not originals, of any important, personal documents that should remain in his possession and redacted copies, not originals, of any documents that require redaction in accordance with the Courts prior Order 14 18 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/21/13. (kpr)
August 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Notice (Other) filed by Donald A Bryant. Mr. Bryant is ordered to file a redacted version for public record of the documents he submitted with his July 29, 2013 "Statement-Your Day in Court" within 14 days of this Order. Mr . Bryant is directed to redact the documents to include only the year of an individuals birth and only the last four digits of an individuals social security number, tax-payer identification number, and financial account numbers. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/12/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jamie Goss Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?