Buffalo River Watershed Alliance et al v. Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Buffalo River Watershed Alliance, Arkansas Canoe Club, National Parks Conservation Association and Ozark Society
Defendant: Department of Agriculture, Small Business Administration and Farm Service Agency
Case Number: 4:2013cv00450
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates and approves the parties' stipulation about attorney's fees, 77 . Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees and costs, 72 , is denied as moot. The Court directs the Clerk to amend the docket to reflect the current Administrator of the Farm Service Agency as Val Dolcini. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2015. (jak)
December 8, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT: The Buffalo River Watershed Alliance, the Arkansas Canoe Club, the National Parks Conservation Association, and the Ozark Society are entitled to judgment that the Farm Service Agency and the Small Business Administration violated t he National Environmental Policy Act, and the Endangered Species Act in guaranteeing Farm Credit Services of Western Arkansas's loans to C&H Hog Farms, Inc. The Farm Service Agency and Small Business Administration are entitled to judgment on P laintiffs' claim that the Agencies violated the Buffalo National River Enabling Act. That claim is dismissed with prejudice. The Farm Service Agency is entitled to judgment on Plaintiffs' claim that it violated its own regulation by not con sulting the US National Park Service. All Plaintiffs' other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs are entitled to reasonable costs and may be entitled to a reasonable attorney's fee, as allowed by law. Bill of Costs and any fee motion due by 4 March 2015. The matter is remanded to the Farm Service Agency and the Small Business Administration. The Court retains jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/8/2014. (jak)
December 2, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Buffalo River Watershed Alliance, Arkansas Canoe Club, National Parks Conservation Association, and the Ozark Society are entitled to judgment against the Farm Service Agency and the Small Business Administration for violating the Natio nal Environmental Policy Act and the Endangered Species Act in guaranteeing Farm Credit Services of Western Arkansas's loans to C&H Hog Farms Inc. The Farm Service Agency and Small Business Administration are entitled to judgment on Plaintiffs&# 039; claims that the Agencies violated the Buffalo National River Enabling Act. That claim is dismissed with prejudice. The Farm Service Agency is entitled to judgment on Plaintiffs' claim that it violated its own regulation by not consulting th e US National Park Service. All Plaintiffs' other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may submit a Bill of Costs and any fee motion by 19 December 2014. The matter is remanded to the Farm Service Agency and the Small Business Administration. The Court retains jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/2014. (jak)
October 16, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes all attorneys of record and their staff to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 16 October 2014 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2014. (jak)
May 6, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deeming 30 Motion for Judicial Notice as moot due to the parties' 40 Stipulation. The Court wonders whether the parties can stipulate about the attachments to the Chang affidavit. This would remove a lawyer-as-witness shadow. The Cour t also directs the Clerk to correct the docket: First, 41 is Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Facts; Second, Maria Contreras-Sweet should be substituted for Defendant Jean Hulit. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/6/2014. (jak)
February 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffalo River Watershed Alliance et al v. Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffalo River Watershed Alliance
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Kevin Cassidy
Represented By: Hannah Chang
Represented By: Marianne Engelman Lado
Represented By: Monica Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Canoe Club
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Kevin Cassidy
Represented By: Hannah Chang
Represented By: Marianne Engelman Lado
Represented By: Monica Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Kevin Cassidy
Represented By: Hannah Chang
Represented By: Marianne Engelman Lado
Represented By: Monica Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozark Society
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Kevin Cassidy
Represented By: Hannah Chang
Represented By: Marianne Engelman Lado
Represented By: Monica Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Barclay Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Barclay Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Barclay Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?