DuBois v. Ware et al

Plaintiff: Beau Lee DuBois
Defendant: Alushia Robinson, Terrelle Watts, Vesta Mullins and David Robert Ware
Case Number: 4:2013cv00465
Filed: August 13, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 73 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this with prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Alushia Robinson, and without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/17/2014. (ks)
November 1, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 14 Motion for an Emergency Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/1/13. (vjt)
October 10, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/10/13. (vjt)
October 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's motion to amend 9 and motion for a preliminary injunction 10 are denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/1/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuBois v. Ware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alushia Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrelle Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robert Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Lee DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?