Brazil v. Arkansas Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Mary Brazil
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Case Number: 4:2013cv00468
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/2015. (jak)
March 18, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The First Amended Final Scheduling Order, 42 , is suspended and the 11 May 2015 trial is canceled. A Second Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue, if necessary, after the Court rules on the pending motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2015. (jak)
January 23, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Brazil's Local Rule 56.1 responding statement of facts, 64 , is deficient because it does not comply with the Court's First Amended Final Scheduling Order, 42 . Brazil must correct her statement and file her substituted responding statement of facts by 30 January 2015. Defendant's reply due by 10 February 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 MOTION. Brazil's latest objections, 51 , are overruled. The Court directs DHS to file its second supplemental response to requests for production without attachments. Instead, attach a list of produced materials (using c ategories as needed) and list the approximate number of pages or things produced. This filing, or any part of it, may be under seal to protect confidential materials. DHS's filing due by 7 January 2015. Discovery is closed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
November 12, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 MOTION for Protective Order. The Court orders the Department to stamp "confidential" any document containing information the Department believes is made confidential and protected by law. The Court orders Brazil not to disclose any document marked confidential to any person. The Court orders all parties to redact confidential information from any document filed on the public docket. Finally Brazil shall return all copies of all documents marked confidential to t he Department within thirty days of this Court's entry of Judgment. Thereafter, Brazil must file notice of the return with the Court. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Order for one year after the entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/12/2014. (jak)
October 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing DHS to file, under seal if need be, a complete set of its responses to Brazil's discovery including documents produced. DHS may file conventionally if the material is voluminous. The Court would also appreciate a courtesy copy delivered to chambers no matter how the filing is done. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2014. (jak)
October 8, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 32 Motion to Compel. The Court orders Brazil to appear for a deposition on a date selected by DHS between now and 21 October 2014. Discovery is extended until the same date solely to allow this deposition. The dispositive motions' deadline is extend to 2 November 2014. All other deadlines stand. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/2014. (jak)
April 3, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazil v. Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?