Coates v. Southwest Airlines Company

Plaintiff: Regina D Coates
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv00545
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 41 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/5/2015. (ks)
September 10, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Sealed Motion for preauthorization. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/10/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the 15 motion to withdraw by James Edwards Patrick II and the matter of appointing new counsel to Judge Ray for disposition. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/23/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Southwest Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina D Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?