Naples v. Williams et al

Appellant: James J Naples
Appellee: Renee S Williams and Michael E Collins
Case Number: 4:2013cv00547
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Substitution Order is reversed on the effective date and otherwise affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/26/2015. (jak)
September 29, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reversing the substitution Order on the effective date in Case No. 4:13-cv-547. No-automatic-termination order in Case No. 4:13-cv-499 affirmed. Order denying relief from the stay in Case No. 4:14-cv-201 affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2014. (jak)
September 26, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying on jurisdiction Motions to Dismiss - 11 , 13 , 17 , 20 , & 22 but denying without prejudice to renewal of the no-standing points in the merits briefing. Appellants' briefs due by 15 October 2014, appellee's briefs due twenty-one days after filing of the brief being responded to; reply briefs due ten days thereafter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2014. (jak)
January 13, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating 4:13-cv-667, 4:13-cv-670, and 4:13-cv-723 with this case and the lead case, 4:13-cv-499. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naples v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James J Naples
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Renee S Williams
Represented By: Robert Bynum Gibson, III
Represented By: Thomas S. Streetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael E Collins
Represented By: Fred C. Statum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?