Gardner et al v. Continental Casualty Company et al

Plaintiff: Mark Gardner and Rochelle Gardner
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company, Arkansas Children's Hospital, Gresham Richter, Aaron Metrailer and John Does
Case Number: 4:2013cv00552
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2015 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, the Court finds that this case should be dismissed. The 1 complaint and all claims in this action against the defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/3/2015. (ks)
March 19, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Edie Ervin and Renee Baswell to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, March 23, 2015 through April 3, 2015 subject to the rules contained within this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/19/2015. (jak)
February 2, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims of the plaintiffs against Aaron Metrailer, M.D., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/2/2015. (jak)
October 10, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner et al v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gardner
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Represented By: Bruce L. Mulkey
Represented By: Sach D. Oliver
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Gardner
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Represented By: Bruce L. Mulkey
Represented By: Sach D. Oliver
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Children's Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gresham Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Metrailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?