Moore v. Shock et al

Plaintiff: David P Moore, Sr
Defendant: Seth Ferguson, L Douglas, Lloyd Vincent, John Randall, Andy Shock, Jonathan Fuentes and Michael Rainwater
Case Number: 4:2013cv00594
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 77 Order that was entered today, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/29/2014. (ks)
May 15, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 64 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants' 53 motion to dismiss is granted, and Michael Rainwater and Rainwater, Holt, and Sexton are dismissed as defendants. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/2014. (ks)
February 28, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 MOTION for Reconsideration. This action is again referred to United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe for proceedings consistent with this Order. Moore's alternative motion for a 15-day extension in which to file a notice of appeal is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/2014. (jak)
February 7, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition as this Court's findings, with exception. Plaintiff's claims against L. Douglas, Michael Rainwater, and the law firm of Rainwater, Holt, and Sexton are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
January 14, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Andy Shock, John Randall, Lloyd Vincent, Seth Ferguson, Jonathan Fuentes, and Faulkner County. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Second Amended Complaint and summons on these defendants without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/14/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Shock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Moore, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?