Bunton v. Randall et al

Plaintiff: Ralph Bunton
Defendant: John Randall, Angie Wooley, Lloyd Vincent, Finkleburg and Andy Shock
Case Number: 4:2013cv00610
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 27 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/19/2015. (ks)
December 19, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety, with additional comments; therefore, defts Randall, Vincent, Finkleburg, and Shock are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/19/13. (vjt)
October 30, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an ifp motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an ifp motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/30/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunton v. Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Bunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Wooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finkleburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?