Dague v. Jason's Deli et al

Plaintiff: Michele Dague
Defendant: Jason's Deli and Bourke Harvey
Case Number: 4:2013cv00627
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice this cause of action based on the parties' 50 stipulation for dismissal. Each party is to bear her and its own costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/08/2015. (rhm)
August 20, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 motion to dismiss 2 complaint against Bourke Harvey. Ms. Dauge's claims against Mr. Harvey are dismissed with prejudice. Ms. Dague's claims against Jason's Deli will proceed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/20/2014. (rhm)
November 4, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER provisionally granting the 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michele Dague. Signed by K.P. Roy on 11/4/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dague v. Jason's Deli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Dague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason's Deli
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bourke Harvey
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?