Webb v. Govia et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Defendant: Spaul, Davis and Govia
Case Number: 4:2013cv00643
Filed: November 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; dismissing the complaint, with prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this case is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/2014. (kdr)
November 7, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 24 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION in their entirety in all respects; granting 20 defendants' motion for summary judgment in part; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendants in their official capacities with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/07/2014. (rhm)
November 26, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Faulkner County Jail, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/26/2013. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Govia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Govia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?