Naples v. Williams et al

Appellant: James J Naples
Appellee: Renee S Williams, United States Trustee and Michael E Collins
Case Number: 4:2013cv00667
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Order appointing the Trustee, as supplemented by the addendum, and as clarified by the Order denying the Naples's post-trial motion, is affirmed. The Order denying the post-trial motion is also affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/26/2015. (jak)
September 29, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reversing the substitution Order on the effective date in Case No. 4:13-cv-547. No-automatic-termination order in Case No. 4:13-cv-499 affirmed. Order denying relief from the stay in Case No. 4:14-cv-201 affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2014. (jak)
September 26, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying on jurisdiction Motions to Dismiss - 11 , 13 , 17 , 20 , & 22 - but denying without prejudice to renewal of the no-standing points in the merits briefing. Appellants' briefs due by 15 October 2014, appellee's briefs due twenty-one days after filing of the brief being responded to; reply briefs due ten days thereafter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2014. (jak)
January 13, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating this case with 4:13-cv-499 and 4:13-cv-547. The lead case is 4:13-cv-499. All pending motions, and any related responses and replies, will be transferred to the lead case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/14. (kpr)
December 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 NOTICE of Related Case by James J Naples; Case Number 4:13-cv-499 and 4:13-cv-547 and Motion to Transfer/Consolidate Cases filed by James J Naples. The Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to Judge Marshall. The Court directs, however, that Mr. Naples's motion not be termed so that Judge Marshall may consider his request to consolidate. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naples v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James J Naples
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Renee S Williams
Represented By: Robert Bynum Gibson, III
Represented By: Thomas S. Streetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Patricia Jean Stanley
Represented By: Charles W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael E Collins
Represented By: Fred C. Statum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?